AK HB19 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the registration of commercial vessels; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Registration Of Boats: Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Louise Stutes [R] | Rep. Sarah Vance [R] | Rep. Rebecca Himschoot [I] | Rep. Sara Hannan [D] |
Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] | Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-26 | House | FN7: (DFG) |
2024-04-26 | House | FN6: (ADM) |
2024-04-26 | House | FN5: ZERO(DNR) |
2024-04-26 | House | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2024-04-26 | House | D.JOHNSON, EDGMON |
2024-04-26 | House | DP: CRONK, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, TOMASZEWSKI, JOSEPHSON, HANNAN, GALVIN, STAPP, |
2024-04-26 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 10DP |
2023-04-12 | House | TRA REFERRAL REMOVED |
2023-04-12 | House | FN3: (DFG) |
2023-04-12 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2023-04-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2023-04-12 | House | NR: C.JOHNSON, MCCABE |
2023-04-12 | House | DP: HIMSCHOOT, CARPENTER, MCCORMICK, STUTES, VANCE |
2023-04-12 | House | FSH RPT 5DP 2NR |
2023-03-31 | House | TRA REFERRAL ADDED AFTER FSH |
2023-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2023-03-27 | House | FIN REPLACES RES REFERRAL |
2023-02-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2023-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2023-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT |
2023-01-19 | House | FSH, RES |
2023-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB19 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0019A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0019B.PDF |