AK HB217 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-12 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-12 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing November 14 each year as Dr. Walter Soboleff Day.
Title
Dr. Walter Soboleff Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-12 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: HB 217 |
2014-04-12 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-12 | Senate | HOFFMAN, MEYER, STEDMAN |
2014-04-12 | Senate | DYSON, KELLY, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, |
2014-04-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, OLSON, STEVENS, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, |
2014-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 217 |
2014-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-04-08 | Senate | STA RPT 4DP |
2014-03-28 | Senate | STA |
2014-03-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-27 | House | VERSION: HB 217 |
2014-03-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | STOLTZE, JOHNSON |
2014-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, GUTTENBERG, SADDLER, LEDOUX, |
2014-03-27 | House | PASSED Y35 E4 A1 |
2014-03-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 217 |
2014-03-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, SEATON |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2014-02-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, KELLER, LYNN, HUGHES |
2014-02-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-21 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-02-21 | House | STA RPT 5DP |
2014-01-21 | House | STA |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |