AK HB234 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:00 am in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 10:00 am in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to police officer training; establishing the Missing and Murdered Indigenous Persons Review Commission; relating to missing and murdered indigenous persons; relating to the duties of the Department of Public Safety; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Missing/murdered Indigenous People;report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-03-13 | House | STA REFERRAL REMOVED |
2024-03-11 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA |
2024-03-11 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2024-03-11 | House | NR: MCCABE |
2024-03-11 | House | DP: MEARS, MCKAY, HIMSCHOOT, MCCORMICK |
2024-03-11 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) NEW TITLE 4DP 1NR |
2024-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2024-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MINA, HIMSCHOOT |
2024-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY |
2024-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG |
2024-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GROH |
2024-01-16 | House | CRA, STA |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/24 |
Subjects
Alaska Natives
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Communications
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Education
Employment
Families
Government Organization
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Native Organizations
Public Safety
Safety
Women
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Communications
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Education
Employment
Families
Government Organization
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Native Organizations
Public Safety
Safety
Women
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB234 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0234A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0234B.PDF |