AK HB245 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to licensure as an optometrist; establishing a retired status optometrist license; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Licensing For Optometry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 27 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:06 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: HB 245 | |
2010-04-12 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-12 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-12 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, MEYER | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 245 | |
2010-04-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-09 | DP: PASKVAN, BUNDE, THOMAS, MEYER | |
2010-04-09 | L&C RPT 4DP | |
2010-03-23 | L&C | |
2010-03-23 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-22 | VERSION: HB 245 | |
2010-03-22 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-22 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-22 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-03-22 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 245 | |
2010-03-22 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-22 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-22 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-17 | NR: HAWKER | |
2010-03-17 | STOLTZE | |
2010-03-17 | DP: THOMAS, AUSTERMAN, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, KELLY, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, | |
2010-03-17 | FIN RPT 9DP 1NR | |
2010-03-01 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-01 | NR: BUCH, CHENAULT, T.WILSON | |
2010-03-01 | DP: LYNN, NEUMAN, OLSON | |
2010-03-01 | L&C RPT 3DP 3NR | |
2009-04-18 | L&C, FIN | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |