AK HB27 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/24/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/24/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to hearings on and plans for permanent placement of a child in need of aid; relating to school placement and transportation for children in foster care; relating to foster care transition programs; relating to emergency and temporary placement of a child in need of aid; relating to transitional living arrangements for children in foster care; and amending Rule 17.2, Alaska Child in Need of Aid Rules of Procedure.
Title
Dhss Duties;cina; Foster Care; Adoption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rule (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/24/16 |
2016-07-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 7 4SSLA 16 |
2016-07-11 | House | 2:44 PM 7/7/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, SADDLER, WOOL, KITO |
2016-05-31 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-05-31 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1 |
2016-05-31 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2016-05-31 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 27(HSS) AM S |
2016-05-31 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2016-05-31 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-05-31 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2016-05-31 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 27(HSS) AM S |
2016-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-05-31 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2016-05-31 | Senate | HSS SCS ADOPTED UC |
2016-05-31 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-05-31 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/31/16 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF HCR 401 |
2016-05-23 | House | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2016-04-14 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | NR: COGHILL |
2016-04-14 | Senate | DP: MCGUIRE, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-04-14 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS(HSS) 3DP 1NR |
2016-04-13 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, STOLTZE, GIESSEL |
2016-04-13 | Senate | HSS RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE |
2016-04-04 | Senate | HSS, JUD |
2016-04-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-01 | House | VERSION: CSSSHB 27(JUD) AM |
2016-04-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, TARR |
2016-04-01 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-01 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2016-04-01 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2016-04-01 | House | AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-01 | House | AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-01 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2016-04-01 | House | RESCIND ACTION (ADP) AM 1 UC |
2016-04-01 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2016-04-01 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2016-04-01 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-01 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2016-04-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 27(JUD) |
2016-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, MILLETT |
2016-03-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR |
2016-03-31 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-03-31 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS)(UPDATED FROM RULES) |
2016-03-31 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-31 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2016 |
2016-01-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2015-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-04-15 | House | AM: KELLER |
2015-04-15 | House | DP: CLAMAN, LYNN, FOSTER, GRUENBERG, LEDOUX |
2015-04-15 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1AM |
2015-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, LEDOUX, LYNN, CLAMAN |
2015-04-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-04-03 | House | DP: TARR, FOSTER, WOOL, SEATON |
2015-04-03 | House | HSS RPT 4DP |
2015-03-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2015-03-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, ORTIZ |
2015-02-11 | House | HSS, JUD |
2015-02-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-02-11 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2015-01-21 | House | HSS, JUD |
2015-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15 |
Subjects
Adoption
Age Of Persons
Child Custody
Courts
Disclosure
Families
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Minors
Native Organizations
Privacy
Age Of Persons
Child Custody
Courts
Disclosure
Families
Foster Care
Health & Social Services
Hearings
Minors
Native Organizations
Privacy