AK HB285 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance; relating to mammograms; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Mammograms: Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2024-04-29 | Senate | L&C, HSS |
2024-04-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-26 | House | VERSION: HB 285 |
2024-04-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG, ALLARD, SCHRAGE, STUTES, SADDLER |
2024-04-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-26 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 E2 |
2024-04-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 285 |
2024-04-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY, GALVIN, JOSEPHSON |
2024-04-24 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/26 CALENDAR |
2024-04-24 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N37 E2 |
2024-04-24 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2024-04-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2024-04-17 | House | NR: PRAX |
2024-04-17 | House | DP: FIELDS, SUMNER, RUFFRIDGE, MCCORMICK, MINA |
2024-04-17 | House | HSS RPT 5DP 1NR |
2024-03-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2024-03-21 | House | NR: RUFFRIDGE, WRIGHT, PRAX, SADDLER |
2024-03-21 | House | DP: FIELDS, CARRICK, SUMNER |
2024-03-21 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 4NR |
2024-02-14 | House | HSS REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER L&C |
2024-01-29 | House | L&C REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS |
2024-01-22 | House | HSS, FIN |
2024-01-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |