AK HB333 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to candidate forums and contributions in state election campaigns; relating to the disposition of certain unused campaign contributions; and relating to public office expense term accounts and public office expense term account reserves.
Title
Campaign Contributions/poet Accts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/22/12 | |
2012-05-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/24 CHAPTER 44 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-16 | 4:51 PM 5/16/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-15 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: CSHB 333(STA) AM S | |
2012-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y18 N- A2 | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 333(STA) AM S | |
2012-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 36 | |
2012-04-15 | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION | |
2012-04-15 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-04-11 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, GIESSEL, MEYER | |
2012-04-11 | STA RPT 5DP | |
2012-03-21 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD | |
2012-03-21 | STA | |
2012-03-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-19 | VERSION: CSHB 333(STA) | |
2012-03-19 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-03-19 | PASSED Y36 E2 A2 | |
2012-03-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 333(STA) | |
2012-03-19 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-19 | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-19 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-19 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2012 | |
2012-03-15 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2012-03-15 | NR: JOHANSEN | |
2012-03-15 | DP: KELLER, GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2012-03-15 | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 5DP 1NR | |
2012-02-22 | COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG | |
2012-02-20 | STA | |
2012-02-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |