AK HB355 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the crime of criminally negligent burning; relating to protection of and fire management on forested land; relating to prohibited acts and penalties for prohibited acts on forested land; requiring the Alaska Supreme Court to establish a bail schedule; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fire;forest Land; Crimes;fire Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2018-07-23 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/20 CHAPTER 63 SLA 18 |
2018-07-17 | House | 11:25 AM 7/17/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y31 N8 E1 |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 355(JUD) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N4 E1 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 355(JUD) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, KELLY, SHOWER |
2018-04-23 | Senate | DP: COGHILL |
2018-04-23 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE |
2018-04-10 | Senate | JUD |
2018-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 355(JUD) |
2018-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-09 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2018-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2018-04-06 | House | CHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-06 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-06 | House | PASSED Y28 N10 E2 |
2018-04-06 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 FAILED Y16 N17 E2 A5 |
2018-04-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 355(JUD) |
2018-04-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR |
2018-04-05 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2018-04-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-04-04 | House | AM: EASTMAN, KOPP |
2018-04-04 | House | NR: LEDOUX |
2018-04-04 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, CLAMAN |
2018-04-04 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 3DP 1NR 2AM |
2018-03-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2018-03-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-03-12 | House | AM: RAUSCHER |
2018-03-12 | House | NR: BIRCH, PARISH, TALERICO |
2018-03-12 | House | DP: LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON, TARR |
2018-03-12 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 4DP 3NR 1AM |
2018-02-16 | House | RES, JUD |
2018-02-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |