AK HB83 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations for the operating and capital expenses of the state's integrated comprehensive mental health program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Mental Health Budget
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09 | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/21 CHAPTER 13 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C) | |
2009-08-05 | 10:55 AM 5/8/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-08-05 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2009-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-15 | CC RPT ADPTD Y17 N2 V1 CCS HB 83 | |
2009-04-15 | TAKEN UP | |
2009-04-15 | CC REPORT READ AND HELD | |
2009-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-15 | CC RPT ADPTD Y32 N7 E1 CCS HB 83 | |
2009-04-15 | CC REPORT: CCS HB 83 | |
2009-04-10 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2009-04-09 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2009-04-08 | HOFFMAN (CHAIR), STEDMAN, THOMAS | |
2009-04-08 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2009-04-08 | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 V1 | |
2009-04-08 | RECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP | |
2009-04-07 | RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND HELD | |
2009-04-06 | HAWKER (CHAIR), STOLTZE, CRAWFORD | |
2009-04-06 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2009-04-06 | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N38 E2 | |
2009-04-02 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2009-04-01 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 83(FIN) | |
2009-04-01 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2009-04-01 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-01 | PASSED Y15 N4 V1 | |
2009-04-01 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2009-04-01 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N15 V1 | |
2009-04-01 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-01 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 83(FIN) | |
2009-03-30 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR | |
2009-03-30 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-03-30 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-03-30 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2009 | |
2009-03-27 | DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, ELLIS | |
2009-03-27 | FIN RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2009-03-16 | FIN | |
2009-03-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-03-13 | VERSION: CSHB 83(FIN) | |
2009-03-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-03-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-03-13 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2009-03-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 83(FIN) | |
2009-03-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/13 CALENDAR | |
2009-03-12 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-03-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-03-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2009 | |
2009-03-12 | NR: GARA, CRAWFORD, SALMON | |
2009-03-12 | DP: THOMAS, R.FOSTER, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER, STOLTZE | |
2009-03-12 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 3NR | |
2009-01-22 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2009-01-22 | OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003 | |
2009-01-22 | FIN | |
2009-01-22 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alcohol
Appropriations
Budget
Capital Projects
Disabilities
Drugs
Foster Care
Grants
Health & Social Services
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Mental Health
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Senior Citizens
Appropriations
Budget
Capital Projects
Disabilities
Drugs
Foster Care
Grants
Health & Social Services
Labor Relations
Medical Care
Mental Health
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Employees
Senior Citizens