AK HCR26 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 163, increasing the allowances for injury, disability, or heart attack payable from the fishermen's fund.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 163
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 44 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:00 PM 5/20/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: HCR 26 | |
2010-04-14 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-14 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | TAKEN UP AND READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: HCR 26 | |
2010-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y36 A4 | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | RLS FOR CALENDARING | |
2010-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boats & Boating
Disabilities
Employment
Fish & Game (fish)
Funds
Insurance
Labor
Medical Care
Uniform Rules
Vessels
Disabilities
Employment
Fish & Game (fish)
Funds
Insurance
Labor
Medical Care
Uniform Rules
Vessels