AK HJR23 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-15)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/04 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-15)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/04 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming March 27, 2014, as Good Friday Earthquake Remembrance Day.
Title
Good Friday Earthquake Remembrance Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 3/04 LEGIS RESOLVE 26 |
2014-03-03 | House | 12:52 PM 3/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-02-24 | Senate | VERSION: HJR 23 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-02-24 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | OLSON |
2014-02-24 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, COGHILL, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEDMAN, KELLY, DYSON, |
2014-02-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 23 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL |
2014-02-21 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP |
2014-02-10 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, FAIRCLOUGH, MICCICHE, FRENCH |
2014-02-10 | Senate | STA |
2014-02-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-07 | House | VERSION: HJR 23 |
2014-02-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, PRUITT, REINBOLD |
2014-02-07 | House | PASSED Y34 E4 A1 V1 |
2014-02-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 23 |
2014-02-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/7/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-02-05 | House | DP: MILLETT, GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-02-05 | House | STA RPT 7DP |
2014-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE |
2014-01-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, JOSEPHSON |
2014-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2014-01-24 | House | FEIGE, TARR, NAGEAK, KREISS-TOMKINS, GRUENBERG, HOLMES |
2014-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, HIGGINS, FOSTER, LEDOUX, KELLER, HERRON, TUCK, HUGHES, |
2014-01-21 | House | STA |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |