AK HJR47 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Coast Guard to amend its regulations relating to small vessels transporting fuel and supplies to remote communities and businesses in the state.
Title
Small Vessel Cargo Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. David Guttenberg [D] | Rep. Kyle Johansen [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Beth Kerttula [D] |
Rep. Jay Ramras [R] | Rep. William Thomas [R] | Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 68 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:18 PM 6/10/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-17 | VERSION: HJR 47 | |
2010-04-17 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-17 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 47 | |
2010-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-04-09 | DP: KOOKESH, MENARD, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MEYER | |
2010-04-09 | TRA RPT 5DP | |
2010-04-02 | TRA | |
2010-04-02 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-01 | VERSION: HJR 47 | |
2010-04-01 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-01 | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA, JOHNSON, THOMAS, RAMRAS | |
2010-04-01 | PASSED Y36 E2 A2 | |
2010-04-01 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 47 | |
2010-04-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-01 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-01 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-03-24 | AM: P.WILSON | |
2010-03-24 | DP: JOHANSEN, MUNOZ, T.WILSON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN | |
2010-03-24 | TRA RPT 5DP 1AM | |
2010-02-23 | TRA | |
2010-02-23 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |