AK HR3 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Special Committee On Fisheries
Title
House Special Committee On Fisheries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 3 |
2019-04-05 | House | 4:45 P.M. 4/4/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-15 | House | MEMBERS: NEUMAN REPLACED PRUITT |
2019-02-19 | House | STUTES (CHAIR), EDGMON, KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR, VANCE, PRUITT |
2019-02-15 | House | VERSION: HR 3 |
2019-02-15 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2019-02-15 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2019-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |