AK HR6 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that the North Pacific Fishery Management Council take action to reduce the quantity of Chinook salmon bycatch in the Gulf of Alaska and Bering Sea trawl fisheries by setting new limits in the Gulf of Alaska trawl fisheries and lowering the existing limits in the Gulf of Alaska and Bering Sea pollock fisheries to at least half of the current limits.
Title
Chinook Bycatch Limits
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR |
2013-04-02 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.FSH) |
2013-03-22 | House | NR: JOHNSON, FEIGE, GATTIS, OLSON |
2013-03-22 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, SEATON |
2013-03-22 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 2DP 4NR |
2013-03-13 | House | FSH |
2013-03-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |