AK SB1 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/24/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/24/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act increasing the minimum hourly wage; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alaska Minimum Wage
Sponsors
Sen. Bettye Davis [D] | Sen. Johnny Ellis [D] | Sen. Hollis French [D] | Sen. Linda Menard [R] |
Sen. Joe Paskvan [D] | Sen. Joe Thomas [D] | Sen. William Wielechowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/24/09 | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/9 CHAPTER 56 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | 8:25 AM 6/30/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: CSSB 1(FIN) | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-19 | PASSED Y35 N5 | |
2009-04-19 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2009-04-19 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y16 N21 A3 | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-19 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N23 | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 1(FIN) | |
2009-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009 | |
2009-04-17 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2009-04-17 | AM: GARA, FAIRCLOUGH | |
2009-04-17 | NR: THOMAS, R.FOSTER, JOULE, SALMON, HAWKER | |
2009-04-17 | DNP: KELLY, CRAWFORD | |
2009-04-17 | DP: AUSTERMAN | |
2009-04-17 | FIN RPT 1DP 2DNP 5NR 2AM | |
2009-04-10 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): PETERSEN | |
2009-04-10 | FIN | |
2009-04-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-08 | VERSION: CSSB 1(FIN) | |
2009-04-08 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-08 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-08 | PASSED Y17 N2 V1 | |
2009-04-08 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 1(FIN) | |
2009-04-08 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-08 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-08 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-08 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2009-04-07 | NR: STEDMAN, HUGGINS, OLSON | |
2009-04-07 | DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, ELLIS | |
2009-04-07 | FIN RPT CS 3DP 3NR NEW TITLE | |
2009-03-16 | COSPONSOR(S): MENARD | |
2009-02-27 | COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN | |
2009-02-25 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2009-02-25 | AM: BUNDE | |
2009-02-25 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS | |
2009-02-25 | L&C RPT CS 4DP 1AM NEW TITLE | |
2009-01-21 | L&C, FIN | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-21 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09 |