AK SB103 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to peer support counseling programs for law enforcement agencies, emergency service providers, and the Department of Corrections.
Title
Peer Support Counseling Program
Sponsors
Sen. Forrest Dunbar [D] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] | Sen. Loki Tobin [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Sen. Catherine Giessel [R] | Rep. Alyse Galvin [I] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-03-14 | House | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2024-03-14 | House | FN3: ZERO(COR) |
2024-03-14 | House | NR: WRIGHT, CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD |
2024-03-14 | House | DP: CARRICK, STORY, SHAW |
2024-03-14 | House | STA RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 4NR |
2023-04-26 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GALVIN |
2023-04-26 | House | STA |
2023-04-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: SB 103 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GIESSEL |
2023-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 103 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CAL |
2023-04-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-04-20 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/23 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): TOBIN |
2023-04-05 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL |
2023-04-05 | Senate | CRA RPT 3DP |
2023-03-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON |
2023-03-15 | Senate | CRA |
2023-03-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |