AK SB118 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
Hearing: May 3 @ 1:30 pm in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
Hearing: May 3 @ 1:30 pm in Adams 519
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to critical and essential minerals.
Title
Critical Natural Resources; Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2024-04-26 | House | REFERRED TO RESOURCES |
2024-04-26 | House | RES, FIN |
2024-04-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 118(FIN) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER, BISHOP, STEDMAN, WILSON |
2024-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y20 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 118(FIN) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CAL |
2024-04-22 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | NR: KIEHL |
2024-04-19 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, WILSON, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2024-03-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, KAWASAKI |
2024-02-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR |
2024-02-15 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2024-02-15 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | AM: KAWASAKI |
2024-02-15 | Senate | NR: CLAMAN, WIELECHOWSKI |
2024-02-15 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, KAUFMAN, DUNBAR |
2024-02-15 | Senate | RES RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM |
2023-03-31 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN, MYERS |
2023-03-29 | Senate | RES |
2023-03-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |