AK SB174 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CAL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CAL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Honor and Remember Flag and the Honor and Sacrifice Flag.
Title
Honor & Remember/honor & Sacrifice Flags
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CAL |
2024-05-01 | Senate | CRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-05-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-30 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL, BJORKMAN |
2024-04-17 | Senate | CRA RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2024-04-02 | Senate | CRA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | CRA |
2024-01-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24 |
Subjects
Buildings
Capital, State
Courts
Death
Families
Fire Protection
Flags
Holidays
Military
Municipalities
Proclamations
Public Safety
Warfare
Capital, State
Courts
Death
Families
Fire Protection
Flags
Holidays
Military
Municipalities
Proclamations
Public Safety
Warfare
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=SB174 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0174A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0174B.PDF |