AK SB190 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to biometric information.
Title
Biometric Information For Id
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-04-09 | FN3: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-09 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-04-09 | NR: COGHILL | |
2010-04-09 | DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN | |
2010-04-09 | JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE | |
2010-03-12 | FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING | |
2010-03-12 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2010-03-12 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-03-12 | AM: MENARD, PASKVAN, FRENCH | |
2010-03-12 | DP: KOOKESH | |
2010-03-12 | STA RPT CS 1DP 3AM SAME TITLE | |
2009-04-11 | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS | |
2009-04-10 | STA, JUD | |
2009-04-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Courts
Crimes
Executive Branch
Law Enforcement
Legislative Agencies
Legislature
Liability
Licensing
Municipalities
Privacy
Public Safety
Torts
Courts
Crimes
Executive Branch
Law Enforcement
Legislative Agencies
Legislature
Liability
Licensing
Municipalities
Privacy
Public Safety
Torts