AK SB256 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing May as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Establish Als Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2024-04-24 | House | NR: CARPENTER |
2024-04-24 | House | DP: C.JOHNSON, STORY, WRIGHT, SHAW |
2024-04-24 | House | STA RPT 4DP 1NR |
2024-03-27 | House | STA |
2024-03-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-25 | Senate | VERSION: SB 256 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-03-25 | Senate | PASSED Y19 E1 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 256 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CAL |
2024-03-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, BJORKMAN |
2024-03-15 | Senate | CRA RPT 3DP |
2024-02-28 | Senate | CRA |
2024-02-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |