AK SB5 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to eligibility requirements for medical assistance for certain children and pregnant women; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical Assistance Eligibility
Sponsors
Sen. Bettye Davis [D] | Sen. Dennis Egan [D] | Sen. Johnny Ellis [D] | Sen. Hollis French [D] |
Sen. Joe Thomas [D] | Sen. William Wielechowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2012-04-07 | FN6: (DHS) | |
2012-04-07 | FN5: (DHS) | |
2012-04-07 | FN4: (DHS) | |
2012-03-23 | AM: EGAN | |
2012-03-23 | NR: MEYER | |
2012-03-23 | DNP: DYSON | |
2012-03-23 | DP: DAVIS | |
2012-03-16 | HSS RPT CS 1DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE | |
2012-03-16 | RETURNED TO HSS COMMITTEE | |
2011-04-14 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE | |
2011-04-14 | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING | |
2011-04-13 | DAVIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2011-04-13 | FAILED PASSAGE Y10 N10 | |
2011-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 5 | |
2011-04-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/13 CALENDAR | |
2011-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-11 | FN3: (DHS) | |
2011-04-11 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2011-04-11 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2011-04-11 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON | |
2011-04-11 | DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2011-04-11 | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR | |
2011-03-30 | FN3: (DHS) | |
2011-03-30 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2011-03-30 | FN1: (DHS) | |
2011-03-30 | AM: MEYER | |
2011-03-30 | DNP: DYSON | |
2011-03-30 | DP: DAVIS, ELLIS, EGAN | |
2011-03-30 | HSS RPT 3DP 1DNP 1AM | |
2011-01-19 | HSS, FIN | |
2011-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |