AK SCR10 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Legis Seafood Industry Task Force
Title
Joint Legis Seafood Industry Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2024-04-26 | House | AM: VANCE |
2024-04-26 | House | NR: C.JOHNSON |
2024-04-26 | House | DP: HIMSCHOOT, MCCORMICK, CARPENTER, STUTES |
2024-04-26 | House | FSH RPT HCS(FSH) 4DP 1NR 1AM |
2024-04-22 | House | FSH |
2024-04-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-19 | Senate | VERSION: CSSCR 10(FIN) AM |
2024-04-19 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | PASSED Y13 E7 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2024-04-19 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-19 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FIN |
2024-03-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |