AK SCR6 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 78
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 78
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 6 |
2019-07-20 | Senate | 1:50 P.M. 7/19/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-13 | House | VERSION: SCR 6 |
2019-05-13 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-05-13 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2019-05-13 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2019-05-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2019-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 6 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2019-05-10 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2019-05-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |