AK SR12 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 SENATE RESOLVE 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 SENATE RESOLVE 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Department of Energy to expeditiously approve a two-year extension of the export license for the Kenai liquefied natural gas plant.
Title
Export License Ext. For Kenai Lng Plant
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 SENATE RESOLVE 9 | |
2010-07-09 | 10:14 AM 6/3/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 | |
2010-04-16 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-16 | TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-15 | TAKEN UP IN SECOND READING AND HELD | |
2010-04-14 | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/15 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-14 | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION | |
2010-04-14 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | TAKEN UP AND READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Business
Economic Development
Energy
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Oil & Gas
Sales
Taxation
Transportation
Utilities
Economic Development
Energy
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Oil & Gas
Sales
Taxation
Transportation
Utilities