AL HB143 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Mobile County Legislation first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Mobile County Legislation first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., co. officers auth. to accept credit card payments, remedies, Act 99-651, 1999 Second Sp. Sess., am'd.
Title
Mobile Co., co. officers auth. to accept credit card payments, remedies, Act 99-651, 1999 Second Sp. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Mobile County Legislation first Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 583 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 582 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Local Legislation, Mobile County Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 240 |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 239 |
2017-03-14 | House | Mobile County Legislation Amendment reported |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |