AL HB163 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9;40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9;40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community College System, established as body corporate, eligibility of employees of system and colleges to participate in TRS and PEEHIP clarified, board authorized to acquire and dispose of property, Secs. 16-60-110.1, 16-60-111.4, 16-60-111.10 am'd.
Title
Community College System, established as body corporate, eligibility of employees of system and colleges to participate in TRS and PEEHIP clarified, board authorized to acquire and dispose of property, Secs. 16-60-110.1, 16-60-111.4, 16-60-111.10 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9;40 a.m. on April 13, 2017. |
2017-04-13 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-171. |
2017-04-13 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-11 | House | McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 492 |
2017-04-11 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 520 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 519 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs Amendment Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Engrossed |
2017-02-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 103 |
2017-02-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 102 |
2017-02-28 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2017-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |