AL HB169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:56 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:56 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas, drilling and production units, pooling of interests, deduction from proceeds due nonconsenting owners, assessment of risk compensation fee against nonconsenting owners further provided for, Sec. 9-17-13 am'd.
Title
Oil and gas, drilling and production units, pooling of interests, deduction from proceeds due nonconsenting owners, assessment of risk compensation fee against nonconsenting owners further provided for, Sec. 9-17-13 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:56 p.m. on May 3, 2017. |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-297. |
2017-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 817 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 162 |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |