AL HB193 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Macon County, judge of probate, prior salary payments ratified
Title
Macon County, judge of probate, prior salary payments ratified
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 83 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 123 |
2024-02-27 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |