AL HB216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, K-12, phase in of computer science courses required, funding for teacher training and certification provided, position created within Dept. of Education to administer, ACHE to create scholarships for preservice teachers, and Computer Science Education task force created
Title
Schools, K-12, phase in of computer science courses required, funding for teacher training and certification provided, position created within Dept. of Education to administer, ACHE to create scholarships for preservice teachers, and Computer Science Education task force created
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:33 p.m. on May 29, 2019. |
2019-05-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-389. |
2019-05-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1095 |
2019-05-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1194 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1193 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-02 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 473 |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 472 |
2019-05-02 | House | Faulkner Amendment Offered |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 471 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-18 | House | Rereferred from EP to W&ME |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |