AL HB223 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on April 7, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on April 7, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal utility boards, Class 7 municipalities, chair and member of certain boards, city council authorized to set compensation, Sec. 11-50-313 am'd.
Title
Municipal utility boards, Class 7 municipalities, chair and member of certain boards, city council authorized to set compensation, Sec. 11-50-313 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 799 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 793 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 207 (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 206 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 793 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 207 (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 206 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on April 7, 2021. |
2021-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-224. |
2021-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 799 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 207 |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |