AL HB238 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Etowah Co., solicitor's fee equal to fee for Fair Trial Tax Fund, distrib. for district attorney's office, effective on adoption of const. amend.
Title
Etowah Co., solicitor's fee equal to fee for Fair Trial Tax Fund, distrib. for district attorney's office, effective on adoption of const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 38 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-01-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 67 | |
2010-01-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |