AL HB238 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stalking in the first and second degree, aggravated stalking in the first and second degree, crimes further provided for, Tracy's Law, Secs. 13A-6-90.1, 13A-6-91.1 added; Secs. 13A-6-90, 13A-6-91 am'd.
Title
Stalking in the first and second degree, aggravated stalking in the first and second degree, crimes further provided for, Tracy's Law, Secs. 13A-6-90.1, 13A-6-91.1 added; Secs. 13A-6-90, 13A-6-91 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 757 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 756 | |
2011-05-05 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |