AL HB240 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, reopened for purchase of prior service credit for service with United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency
Title
Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, reopened for purchase of prior service credit for service with United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Finance and Taxation Education | |
2011-06-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2011-04-21 | PERMISSION GRANTED | |
2011-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 408 | |
2011-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |