AL HB251 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to motor vehicle registrations; to amend Sections 32-6-350 and 32-6-350.1, Code of Alabama 1975, to authorize the issuance of a distinctive motor vehicle license plate for veterans of Operation Inherent Resolve
Title
Relating to motor vehicle registrations; to amend Sections 32-6-350 and 32-6-350.1, Code of Alabama 1975, to authorize the issuance of a distinctive motor vehicle license plate for veterans of Operation Inherent Resolve
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | House | Enacted |
2023-06-06 | House | Enrolled |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-06-06 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-26 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House State Government |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to House State Government |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |