AL HB261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education, Alabama Math and Science Teacher Education Program (AMSTEP) created, ACHE to administer, loan repayment awards to eligible public school math and science teachers in underserved areas of state
Title
Education, Alabama Math and Science Teacher Education Program (AMSTEP) created, ACHE to administer, loan repayment awards to eligible public school math and science teachers in underserved areas of state
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Lovvorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018. |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-504. |
2018-03-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-28 | House | Lovvorn motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1082 |
2018-03-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1086 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1085 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 521 |
2018-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |