AL HB308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County jails and state penitentiaries, prisoners, sheriff and Dept. of Corrections, required to provide feminine hygiene products to female inmates, Secs. 14-3-44, 14-6-19 am'd.
Title
County jails and state penitentiaries, prisoners, sheriff and Dept. of Corrections, required to provide feminine hygiene products to female inmates, Secs. 14-3-44, 14-6-19 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Alexander motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-306. |
2019-05-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-22 | House | Alexander motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 886 |
2019-05-22 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 942 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 941 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 199 |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 198 |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 197 |
2019-04-16 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment #2 Offered |
2019-04-16 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment #1 Offered |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |