AL HB354 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community development districts; proceeds from alcoholic beverage tax in certain districts, distribution provide for
Title
Community development districts; proceeds from alcoholic beverage tax in certain districts, distribution provide for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 554 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 553 UPQUXGD-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 553 UPQUXGD-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Tourism |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Tourism |
2024-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 554 |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 553 UPQUXGD-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Urban and Rural Development Engrossed Substitute Offered UPQUXGD-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Urban and Rural Development UPQUXGD-1 |
2024-04-04 | House | Urban and Rural Development 4th Amendment 4NJAIII-1 |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-03 | House | Urban and Rural Development 1st Amendment |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Urban and Rural Development |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Urban and Rural Development |