AL HB370 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cullman County, allows retired sheriff employees to keep weapons
Title
Cullman County, allows retired sheriff employees to keep weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 496 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 53 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 53 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 53 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 53 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 496 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |