AL HB378 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sex offenders, notification and registration, comprehensive procedure for registration by adult and juvenile sex offenders, notification by law enforcement, employment and residency limited, registration fees authorized, Sex Offender Registration and Community Notification Act, Secs. 13A-11-200, 13A-11-201, 13A-11-202, 15-20-1 to 15-20-38, inclusive, repealed
Title
Sex offenders, notification and registration, comprehensive procedure for registration by adult and juvenile sex offenders, notification by law enforcement, employment and residency limited, registration fees authorized, Sex Offender Registration and Community Notification Act, Secs. 13A-11-200, 13A-11-201, 13A-11-202, 15-20-1 to 15-20-38, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-24 | Vance intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794 | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 793 | |
2011-05-24 | Poole Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 792 | |
2011-05-24 | Galliher Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 791 | |
2011-05-24 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 790 | |
2011-05-24 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2011-03-29 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |