AL HB379 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Advocacy Programs, appropriation for Children's Advocacy Centers and Alabama Network of Children's Advocacy Centers, Inc., for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, allocation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required, conditional appropriation under certain conditions
Title
Children's Advocacy Programs, appropriation for Children's Advocacy Centers and Alabama Network of Children's Advocacy Centers, Inc., for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, allocation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required, conditional appropriation under certain conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-31 | HB379 Rereferred from W&ME to W&MGF | |
2011-03-29 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |