AL HB398 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lauderdale Co., Judicial Commission, created to nominate to the Gov., persons to fill vacancies for circuit or district court judges, Amendment No. 819 and 918 (Section 4.10, Lauderdale Co., Local Constitutional Amendment, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), repealed, const. amend.
Title
Lauderdale Co., Judicial Commission, created to nominate to the Gov., persons to fill vacancies for circuit or district court judges, Amendment No. 819 and 918 (Section 4.10, Lauderdale Co., Local Constitutional Amendment, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), repealed, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Stutts motion to adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to LOCAL APPLICATION (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to LOCAL APPLICATION (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-192. |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Stutts motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 742 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 741 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to LOCAL APPLICATION adopted Roll Call 273 |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 272 |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |