AL HB409 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
District Attorneys; absolute immunity established; duties further provided for
Title
District Attorneys; absolute immunity established; duties further provided for
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 799 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 798 A62YSQ7-1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 798 A62YSQ7-1 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 799 |
2024-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 798 A62YSQ7-1 |
2024-04-25 | House | Judiciary 1st Substitute Offered A62YSQ7-1 |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-17 | House | Judiciary 1st Substitute A62YSQ7-1 |
2024-04-04 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |