AL HB431 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Houston County, further provides for court costs
Title
Houston County, further provides for court costs
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rehm [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 579 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 579 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |