AL HB439 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Pending Senate Education Policy
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Finance and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Pending Senate Education Policy
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Finance and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public K-12 education, employment, qualifications, and training of technology directors
Title
Public K-12 education, employment, qualifications, and training of technology directors
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 814 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Pending Senate Education Policy |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |
2024-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 814 |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Pending House Education Policy |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |