AL HB443 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:00 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:00 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Talladega Co., septage, application to land as fertilizer or soil amendment, prohibited, const. amend.
Title
Talladega Co., septage, application to land as fertilizer or soil amendment, prohibited, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:00 p.m. on May 18, 2020. |
2020-05-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-172. |
2020-05-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 734 |
2020-05-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 733 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
2020-05-08 | House | Jones (M) motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote |
2020-05-08 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 549 |
2020-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 548 |
2020-05-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |