AL HB454 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Died in Senate Basket.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Died in Senate Basket.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Agency, delivery of medical services to Medicaid eligible persons through regional care organizations
Title
Medicaid Agency, delivery of medical services to Medicaid eligible persons through regional care organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Died in Senate Basket. |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 696 |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 695 |
2013-04-23 | House | Hall Amendment Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 694 |
2013-04-23 | House | McClendon Amendment #3 Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 693 |
2013-04-23 | House | McClendon Amendment #2 Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 692 |
2013-04-23 | House | McClendon Amendment #1 Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 691 |
2013-04-23 | House | Health Amendment #2 Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 690 |
2013-04-23 | House | Health Amendment #1 Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 689 |
2013-04-23 | House | Health Substitute Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | HB454 Rereferred from WMGF to Health |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |