AL HB491 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Winfield, city council authorized to establish a theater board for maintenance and operation of Pastime Theater, members, terms, duties, funding
Title
Winfield, city council authorized to establish a theater board for maintenance and operation of Pastime Theater, members, terms, duties, funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Assigned Act No. 2011-322 on 06/02/2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-26 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 767 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 311 | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |