AL HB497 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 4 municipalities, personnel system, eligibility lists, appointments and probationary periods, further provided, Secs. 11-44B-43, 11-44B-44 am'd.
Title
Class 4 municipalities, personnel system, eligibility lists, appointments and probationary periods, further provided, Secs. 11-44B-43, 11-44B-44 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Education Policy |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |