AL HB507 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Monroe Co., judge of probate, recording system established, additional recording fees and transaction fees, distrib. to Judge of Probate Fund
Title
Monroe Co., judge of probate, recording system established, additional recording fees and transaction fees, distrib. to Judge of Probate Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Assigned Act No. 2012-241 on 04/24/2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-19 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-19 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683 | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 431 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |