AL HB522 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Randolph Co., tobacco tax, collection and distrib. altered, Act 2003-213, 2003 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Randolph Co., tobacco tax, collection and distrib. altered, Act 2003-213, 2003 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Fincher [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2017 at 5:49 p.m. on May 3, 2017. |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-312. |
2017-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 870 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 654 |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |